SD SB108 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions related to cooperatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions related to cooperatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
2021-03-02HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1
2021-03-02HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 279
2021-02-08HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 238
2021-02-05SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201
2021-02-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-04SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 114

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback