SD SB106 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit certain minors from using wireless communication devices while operating motor vehicles upon the public highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit certain minors from using wireless communication devices while operating motor vehicles upon the public highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-25HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 757
2013-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 838
2013-03-08HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 754
2013-03-08HouseSigned by President S.J. 745
2013-03-06HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 10. S.J. 698
2013-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 23. H.J. 640
2013-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 593
2013-02-27HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 584
2013-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 30. H.J. 583
2013-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 583 Amendment 106oa
2013-02-26HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 541
2013-02-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-02-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 424
2013-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 345
2013-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 332
2013-02-04SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 303
2013-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-18SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 145

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback