SD SB105 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 39. H.J. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 39. H.J. 507
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding operator's licenses, instruction permits, and restricted minor's permits.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding operator's licenses, instruction permits, and restricted minor's permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Placed on calendar (Y: 29 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to another day (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Transportation: Deferred to another day (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Placed on calendar, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 39. H.J. 507 |
2021-03-03 | House | Transportation Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Transportation, Passed H.J. 481 |
2021-02-25 | House | Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2021-02-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8. |
2021-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | House | Transportation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5. H.J. 1 |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-10 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 273 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 226 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 105A |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 115 |