SD SB103 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the confidentiality of personal information of persons affiliated with nonprofit corporations.
Title
Provide for the confidentiality of personal information of persons affiliated with nonprofit corporations.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] |
Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 429 |
2021-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 487 |
2021-03-01 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 103D |
2021-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 323 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 280 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 103B |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 114 |