SD SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Codify legislation enacted in 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codify legislation enacted in 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateSigned by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
2021-02-03SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 03, 2021 S.J. 167
2021-02-02HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 176
2021-02-01SenateSigned by the President S.J. 149
2021-01-28HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 155
2021-01-27HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 1
2021-01-27HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-01-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 60
2021-01-20SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 98
2021-01-19SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-01-19SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-01-19SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback