SD HJR1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by the President S.J. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Signed by the President S.J. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next election a Constitutional amendment to revise certain provisions relating to the rights of crime victims.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next election a Constitutional amendment to revise certain provisions relating to the rights of crime victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Taxation Concurred in Resolution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend resolution (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Taxation Concurred in Resolution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Secretary of State |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 725 |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 645 Amendment j1004ata |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 645 |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 643 Amendment j1004aa |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 613 |
2018-02-26 | House | Taxation Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 597 |
2018-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-22 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 557 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 532 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 492 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | State Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 449 Amendment j1004jtb |
2018-02-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j1004jc |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 180 |