SD HCR6022 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the State Trade Office in the Governor's Office of Economic Development to promote international business and trade on behalf of South Dakota exporters.
Title
Urging the State Trade Office in the Governor's Office of Economic Development to promote international business and trade on behalf of South Dakota exporters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 |
2020-03-05 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-05 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-03 | House | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 402 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 6. H.J. 440 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 420 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 401 |