SD HCR6015 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To encourage the Executive Board of the Legislature to create an interim legislative study on mental health education in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To encourage the Executive Board of the Legislature to create an interim legislative study on mental health education in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateSenate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 428
2021-03-03SenateHealth and Human Services Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-02SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 376
2021-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 437
2021-02-25HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 398

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback