SD HCR6012 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Acknowledging the challenges and responses during the COVID-19 pandemic and committing to accountability and action.
Title
Acknowledging the challenges and responses during the COVID-19 pandemic and committing to accountability and action.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Aylward [R] | Sen. Julie Frye-Mueller [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Carl Perry [R] |
Sen. Tom Pischke [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 227 |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading House H.J. 210 |
Subjects
South Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/25287 |
Text | https://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/264092.pdf |
Roll Call | https://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/79510 |