SD HCR6012 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To encourage the Executive Board of the Legislature to reauthorize the Mental Health of First Responders Task Force interim legislative study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To encourage the Executive Board of the Legislature to reauthorize the Mental Health of First Responders Task Force interim legislative study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Health and Human Services: Adopt Resolution (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 538
2021-03-08SenateSenate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 428
2021-03-08SenateSenate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 428 Amendment HCR6012A
2021-03-04SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 416
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 6. H.J. 482
2021-03-02HouseHealth and Human Services Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
2021-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseFirst read and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 398

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback