SD HCR6008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 391
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 391
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To reauthorize the Mental Health Services Delivery Task Force for the limited purposes of monitoring the growth and development of current initiatives in the delivery of mental health services, reviewing and proposing adjustments to the levels of funding, and ensuring that the statutory and regulatory framework complements intended outcomes.
Title
To reauthorize the Mental Health Services Delivery Task Force for the limited purposes of monitoring the growth and development of current initiatives in the delivery of mental health services, reviewing and proposing adjustments to the levels of funding, and ensuring that the statutory and regulatory framework complements intended outcomes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Adopt Resolution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services: Adopt Resolution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Adopt Resolution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services: Adopt Resolution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 391 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 329 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 328 |
2021-02-18 | House | Health and Human Services Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 234 |
2021-02-04 | House | First Reading H.J. 208 |