SD HCR6003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 303
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 303
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appointing Mr. Russell Olson of Pierre, South Dakota, to the Office of Auditor General.
Title
Appointing Mr. Russell Olson of Pierre, South Dakota, to the Office of Auditor General.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Rep. Randy Gross [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Placed on consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Adopt Resolution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Placed on consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Adopt Resolution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House of Representatives: Adopt Resolution (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 303 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 296 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | State Affairs Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 156 |
2021-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 147 |