SD HCR1006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 632
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Instructing South Dakota's congressional representatives to support an effort in Congress to terminate the U.S. Department of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructing South Dakota's congressional representatives to support an effort in Congress to terminate the U.S. Department of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Report out of committee without recommendation as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Education Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 632
2019-03-05SenateEducation Report out of committee without recommendation as amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 604
2019-03-05SenateEducation Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3.
2019-03-05SenateEducation Motion to amend resolution, Passed Amendment c1006ca
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Senate Education S.J. 412
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading Senate S.J. 383
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 21. H.J. 390
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced H.J. 369

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback