SD HCR1005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 195
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress and the President to secure the blessings of life and liberty for our posterity.
Title
Urging Congress and the President to secure the blessings of life and liberty for our posterity.
Sponsors
Sen. Stace Nelson [R] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] | Rep. Steve Hickey [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] |
Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. Isaac Latterell [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Manny Steele [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. Bill Van Gerpen [R] |
Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 195 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 181 |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 128 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 11. H.J. 99 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 99 Amendment c1005ta |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 78 |