SD HCR1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 66-11)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 471
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Strengthening the sister-state ties between the State of South Dakota and Taiwan; supporting the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) between Taiwan and the United States; and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthening the sister-state ties between the State of South Dakota and Taiwan; supporting the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) between Taiwan and the United States; and reaffirming support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.

Sponsors

Rep. Tim Rounds [R]Rep. David Anderson [R]Rep. Hugh Bartels [R]Rep. Doug Barthel [R]
Rep. Arch Beal [R]Rep. Shawn Bordeaux [D]Rep. Scyller Borglum [R]Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]Rep. Ryan Cwach [D]Rep. Drew Dennert [R]
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R]Rep. Linda Duba [D]Rep. Mary Duvall [R]Rep. Caleb Finck [R]
Rep. Bob Glanzer [R]Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R]Rep. Brian Gosch [R]Rep. Lana Greenfield [R]
Rep. Randy Gross [R]Rep. Dayle Hammock [R]Rep. Jon Hansen [R]Rep. Steven Haugaard [R]
Rep. Erin Healy [D]Rep. Taffy Howard [R]Rep. Jean Hunhoff [R]Rep. Kevin Jensen [R]
Rep. Timothy Johns [R]Rep. Chris Johnson [R]Rep. David Johnson [R]Rep. Chris Karr [R]
Rep. Lance Koth [R]Rep. John Lake [R]Rep. Isaac Latterell [R]Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D]
Rep. Steve Livermont [R]Rep. Sam Marty [R]Rep. Steven McCleerey [D]Rep. John Mills [R]
Rep. Paul Miskimins [R]Rep. Tina Mulally [R]Rep. Jess Olson [R]Rep. Herman Otten [R]
Rep. Carl Perry [R]Rep. Kent Peterson [R]Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]
Rep. Doug Post [R]Rep. Peri Pourier [D]Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Tony Randolph [R]
Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]Rep. Tim Reed [R]Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R]Rep. Ray Ring [D]
Rep. Michael Saba [D]Rep. Kyle Schoenfish [R]Rep. Jamie Smith [D]Rep. Tamara St John [R]
Rep. Manny Steele [R]Rep. Kelly Sullivan [D]Rep. Kaleb Weis [R]Rep. Marli Wiese [R]
Rep. Mark Willadsen [R]Rep. Nancy York [R]Rep. Larry Zikmund [R]Sen. Gary Cammack [R]
Sen. Rocky Blare [R]Sen. Richard Curd [R]Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Joshua Klumb [R]
Sen. Ryan Maher [R]Sen. Stace Nelson [R]Sen. Jeff Partridge [R]Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]
Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]

Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseSenate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 471
2019-02-21HouseIntroduced S.J. 457
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 449
2019-02-11HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 354
2019-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 279
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced H.J. 249

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback