SD HB1314 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the personal possession of a loaded firearm while in possession of cannabis or cannabis products and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Prohibit the personal possession of a loaded firearm while in possession of cannabis or cannabis products and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Tina Mulally [R] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Tabled (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Judiciary Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1314A |
2022-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 211 |
2022-02-02 | House | First Reading House H.J. 178 |