SD HB1279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require property owners to receive notification of property tax reduction programs.
Title
Require property owners to receive notification of property tax reduction programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 502 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 477 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 322 |
2020-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 349 |
2020-02-20 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-20 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 257 |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading House H.J. 210 |