SD HB1271 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 34. H.J. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for the purchase of a new online voter registration system and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for the purchase of a new online voter registration system and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 34. H.J. 388
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3.
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1271A
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-16HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293
2021-02-04HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 209

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback