SD HB1270 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the conditions pursuant to which the state may enter into tax collection agreements with Indian tribes.
Title
Revise the conditions pursuant to which the state may enter into tax collection agreements with Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Edward Iron Cloud [D] | Sen. Kevin Killer [D] |
Sen. Larry Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 846 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 801 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 597 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 536 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 436 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 548 | |
2010-02-19 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 498 | |
2010-02-18 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. H.J. 461 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 291 |