SD HB1266 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the improvement of information technology servers and infrastructure of state government and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the improvement of information technology servers and infrastructure of state government and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 478 |
2021-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 H.J. 554 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 537 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 435 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 417 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1266A |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 340 |
2021-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 362 |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293 |
2021-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 209 |