SD HB1263 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide price transparency for health care costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide price transparency for health care costs.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 502
2021-03-03SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
2021-03-01SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 330
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 332
2021-02-18HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-18HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-04HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 212

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback