SD HB1261 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
2019-03-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 681
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 710
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 653
2019-03-06SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
2019-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 562
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 368
2019-02-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 377
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
2019-02-08HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 338
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 265

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback