SD HB1260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the definition of federal law enforcement officer to include certain United States Forest Service personnel.
Title
Revise the definition of federal law enforcement officer to include certain United States Forest Service personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Signed by Governor H.J. 762 | |
2010-03-04 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 664 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 481 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 468 | |
2010-02-23 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 332 | |
2010-02-12 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 384 | |
2010-02-11 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 362 | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 289 |