SD HB1255 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation from the coordinated natural resources conservation fund to the State Conservation Commission, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation from the coordinated natural resources conservation fund to the State Conservation Commission, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-04SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596
2019-02-28SenateSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 579
2019-02-26SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 525
2019-02-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 476
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 470
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 427
2019-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 327
2019-02-05HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 291
2019-01-31HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 263

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback