SD HB1254 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit preferential treatment in higher education employment practices.
Title
Prohibit preferential treatment in higher education employment practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] | Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] |
Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Bethany Soye [R] |
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570 |
2021-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 502 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 394 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 330 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 332 |
2021-02-17 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-17 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-17 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1254G |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |