SD HB1252 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit certain government entities from restricting the wearing of tribal regalia during certain events.
Title
Prohibit certain government entities from restricting the wearing of tribal regalia during certain events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 728 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 720 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 654 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1252ja |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 465 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 2. H.J. 428 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 428 Amendment 1252aa |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 391 |
2018-02-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 374 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 247 |
Subjects
Counties
Local Government
Municipal Government
School Districts
State Affairs and Government
Tribal Government
Local Government
Municipal Government
School Districts
State Affairs and Government
Tribal Government