SD HB1251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 652
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

License out-of-state multi-jurisdictional totalizator hubs and distribute source market fees to the special racing revolving fund and the South Dakota-bred racing fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License out-of-state multi-jurisdictional totalizator hubs and distribute source market fees to the special racing revolving fund and the South Dakota-bred racing fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 652
2019-03-06SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
2019-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 562
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 528
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 24. H.J. 527
2019-02-25HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 526
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 45, NAYS 22. H.J. 525
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed H.J. 456 Amendment 1251ytb
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2.
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1251yc
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 263

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1251&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1251P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1251HST.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28520&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28815&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28817&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28818&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29055&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29306&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback