SD HB1250 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 32. H.J. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors and marriage and family therapists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding professional counselors and marriage and family therapists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House of Representatives Failed to concur (Y: 39 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 32. H.J. 735
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 733 Amendment Cc1250a
2019-03-12SenateHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 718
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 702 Amendment Cc1250a
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 701
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee Report S.J. 702 Amendment Cc1250a
2019-03-12SenateSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 691
2019-03-11SenateHouse of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 27. H.J. 709
2019-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 634
2019-03-04SenateHealth and Human Services Title amended, Passed S.J. 563 Amendment 1250bta
2019-03-04SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1.
2019-03-04SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1250bd
2019-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 476
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 465
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423
2019-02-12HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 366
2019-02-12HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1250bb
2019-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 262

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1250&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1250P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1250HHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1250SHE.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28126&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28599&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29086&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29260&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29368&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29478&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback