SD HB1248 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Require reports regarding the intentional disposal, destruction, or other disposition of human embryos.
Title
Require reports regarding the intentional disposal, destruction, or other disposition of human embryos.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 330 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 21. H.J. 333 |
2021-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 333 Amendment 1248G |
2021-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 323 |
2021-02-16 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2021-02-16 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248E |
2021-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |