SD HB1246 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for increase in participation of entrepreneurship and state economic development initiatives by the nine federally recognized tribes in South Dakota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for increase in participation of entrepreneurship and state economic development initiatives by the nine federally recognized tribes in South Dakota.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 539
2019-02-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 501
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1246ktb
2019-02-20HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1246kb
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 262

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback