SD HB1246 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-09 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, midlevel practitioners, and dentists who have complied with the requirements of the physician tuition reimbursement program, the midlevel tuition reimbursement program, and the dental tuition reimbursement program.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, midlevel practitioners, and dentists who have complied with the requirements of the physician tuition reimbursement program, the midlevel tuition reimbursement program, and the dental tuition reimbursement program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2011-03-03 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 620 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 585 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 559 | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 518 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 469 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 424 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-14 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384 | |
2011-02-10 | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 352 | |
2011-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 225 |