SD HB1242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Include opossums within the definition of predator and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Include opossums within the definition of predator and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateSigned by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
2019-03-06SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the President S.J. 618
2019-03-04SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 17. H.J. 587
2019-02-26SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 523
2019-02-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 512
2019-02-21SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed S.J. 451 Amendment 1242jta
2019-02-21SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2019-02-21SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1242jb
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 351
2019-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 360
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 318
2019-02-07HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1242ja
2019-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 261

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1242&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1242P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1242HAG.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1242SAG.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1242ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27888&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28115&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28577&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28877&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29031&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback