SD HB1241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain provisions regarding training for human trafficking prevention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain provisions regarding training for human trafficking prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseCommerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 389
2019-02-13HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1241kc
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-11HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 281
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 261

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback