SD HB1236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 H.J. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 H.J. 718
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the acquisition of certain motor vehicle titles by auction agencies in certain circumstances.
Title
Provide for the acquisition of certain motor vehicle titles by auction agencies in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 H.J. 718 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 H.J. 666 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 646 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 638 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 604 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 579 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 420 |
2018-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 373 |
2018-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 329 |
2018-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1236wa |
2018-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-02 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 206 |