SD HB1235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Board of Regents performance improvement fund and make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Create the Board of Regents performance improvement fund and make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. David Lust [R] |
Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] | Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 42 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-11 | Signed by President S.J. 699 | |
2011-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 738 | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 727 | |
2011-03-09 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 13. H.J. 703 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 658 Amendment 1235mtb | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 657 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 657 Amendment 1235mb | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 640 | |
2011-03-03 | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 607 | |
2011-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-17 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 469 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 431 | |
2011-02-14 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 366 | |
2011-02-14 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1235ca | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 223 |