SD HB1230 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 524
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Add clergy to the list of mandatory reporters for suspected child abuse or neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add clergy to the list of mandatory reporters for suspected child abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 28 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 39. H.J. 524
2019-02-25HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 523
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 34. H.J. 522
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 522 Amendment 1230kb
2019-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 465
2019-02-20HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 447
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 280
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 259

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback