SD HB1230 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 579
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Affirm the sanctity of human life.
Title
Affirm the sanctity of human life.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Tabled (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 579 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 476 |
2015-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 457 Amendment 1230xta |
2015-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 457 |
2015-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 456 Amendment 1230xa |
2015-02-17 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 406 |
2015-02-17 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1230ca |
2015-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services, Passed H.J. 326 |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 285 |
2015-02-03 | House | First read in House H.J. 266 |