SD HB1229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Require optional services through Medicaid to be authorized through special appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require optional services through Medicaid to be authorized through special appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Reconsidered (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 664
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 622
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1229jb
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 546
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 476
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 23. H.J. 465
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-14HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 404
2019-02-14HouseHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1229wa
2019-02-14HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-31HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 280
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 258

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1229&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1229P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1229HHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1229SAP.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28310&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28602&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29003&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29212&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29213&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29332&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback