SD HB1226 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 42. H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 42. H.J. 390
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding local referendums.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding local referendums.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 25, NAYS 42. H.J. 390 |
2020-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 370 |
2020-02-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-19 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1226A |
2020-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 241 |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading House H.J. 116 |