SD HB1220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the provision of informed consent by a pregnant minor.
Title
Authorize the provision of informed consent by a pregnant minor.
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Sydney Davis [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Healy Keintz [D] | Rep. Jess Olson [R] | Rep. Peri Pourier [D] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] |
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2021-02-23 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 7. |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services, Passed H.J. 234 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 212 |
2021-02-03 | House | First Reading House H.J. 190 |