SD HB1212 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to fund the industrial hemp licensure program and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to fund the industrial hemp licensure program and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 664
2019-03-06SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
2019-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 538
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 553
2019-02-25HouseJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 4. H.J. 530
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 462
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459
2019-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 255

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback