SD HB1211 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the payment process for forensic medical examinations.
Title
Change the payment process for forensic medical examinations.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Tabled (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 117 |
2020-01-30 | House | First Reading House H.J. 98 |