SD HB1211 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a grace period after the expiration of a permit and a warning ticket for carrying a concealed pistol while in possession of an expired permit.
Title
Provide for a grace period after the expiration of a permit and a warning ticket for carrying a concealed pistol while in possession of an expired permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 H.J. 700 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 588 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 568 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 524 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 466 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 466 Amendment 1211fb |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 402 |
2017-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 294 |