SD HB1209 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to purchase outstanding debt and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the Board of Regents to purchase outstanding debt and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - Referred to (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-05HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 194

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback