SD HB1204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise criminal provisions regarding certain visual recordings or photographic devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise criminal provisions regarding certain visual recordings or photographic devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 527
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 450
2021-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 418
2021-03-02SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-03-02SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 304
2021-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 323
2021-02-17HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-17HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 177

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback