SD HB1204 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 624
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the production and sale of industrial hemp.
Title
Authorize the production and sale of industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 624 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 5. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 557 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 508 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 415 |
2017-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 293 |