SD HB1199 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish the Office of Liaison for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish the Office of Liaison for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-10SenateSigned by the President S.J. 470
2021-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 H.J. 547
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 434
2021-03-04SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-03-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-03-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-03-01SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary, Passed S.J. 364
2021-02-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 340
2021-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 12. H.J. 360
2021-02-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-02HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 178

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback