SD HB1197 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Taxation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Taxation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt air ambulance services from sales and use taxes.
Title
Exempt air ambulance services from sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Taxation Tabled (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Reconsidered (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Reconsidered (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Taxation Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Title amended, Passed Amendment 1197fta | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1197fa | |
2012-02-13 | Taxation Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. | |
2012-02-10 | Taxation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 358 | |
2012-02-10 | Taxation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. | |
2012-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 262 | |
2012-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 287 | |
2012-01-31 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 4. H.J. 256 | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 159 |