SD HB1195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 H.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Indian Education Advisory Council to make an annual report to the Governor and the State-Tribal Relations Committee.
Title
Direct the Indian Education Advisory Council to make an annual report to the Governor and the State-Tribal Relations Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2022 H.J. 640 |
2022-03-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2022 H.J. 512 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 429 |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 495 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 399 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 233 |
2022-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 250 |
2022-02-07 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 156 |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 139 |