SD HB1193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a criminal penalty for causing an abortion against a pregnant mother's will.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a criminal penalty for causing an abortion against a pregnant mother's will.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 20, 2019 H.J. 760
2019-03-07SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 H.J. 674
2019-03-06SenateSigned by the President S.J. 637
2019-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 647
2019-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-28SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 547
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 521
2019-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 536
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 494
2019-02-22HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1193wb
2019-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1193wa
2019-02-13HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 251

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback